OR HB4115 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defines "vapor product" and "vape." Amends laws related to consumption of tobacco products by minors to include references to consumption of vapor products by minors, including crime of endangering welfare of minor and other criminal offenses and civil penalties related to use or acquisition of tobacco by minor. Amends laws related to smoking in public to include references to vaping in public. Amends offense of smoking in a motor vehicle so that person commits offense if person vapes in motor vehicle. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to vapor products; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2014-02-07 | House | Public Hearing and Possible Work Session cancelled. |
2014-02-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2014R1/Measures/Overview/HB4115 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4115/Introduced |