OR HB4113 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Bureau of Labor and Industries to conduct inquiries and investigations, including criminal records checks, to determine whether employer and any employees of employer have adequate character and fitness to employ minors in compliance with provisions relating to employment of minors. Requires Commissioner of Bureau of Labor and Industries to adopt rules no later than January 1, 2021. Requires submission of attestation form before bureau may issue annual employment certification to employer. Authorizes commissioner to deny, revoke or refuse to issue employment certification and impose civil penalty if employer falsifies or misrepresents information in attestation form or permits employee who is required to report as sex offender to have direct contact with minor who is employed by employer. Allows minor who is employed by employer and who claims to be aggrieved by employer's failure to comply with requirements to file civil action. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to employment of minors; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2020-02-14 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2020-02-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |