OR HB4113 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies conditions that must be met before State Treasurer may issue bonds to pay for Interstate 5 bridge replacement project. Requires Department of Transportation to prepare report on regional transportation projects in need of additional funding. Sunsets January 2, 2017. Prohibits owner of vehicle from operating or permitting operation of vehicle on tollway if owner of vehicle owes toll for use of that vehicle on that tollway or civil penalty or fee related to failure to pay toll. Punishes by maximum fine of $1,000. Creates offense of failure to pay toll. Punishes by maximum fine of $250. Authorizes issuance of citation on basis of photographs for certain tollway-related offenses. Authorizes Department of Transportation to impound or immobilize vehicle for failure to pay toll under certain circumstances. Directs department to secure intergovernmental agreement with State of Washington regarding collection of tolls from users of Interstate 5 bridges. Expands offense of permitting unlawful operation of vehicle. Directs Oregon Transportation Commission to establish Mobility Council. Restores reciprocal taxation exemption for certain interstate bridges. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to transportation; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-02-13 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2014-02-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2014-02-13 | House | Work Session cancelled. |
2014-02-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-12 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |