OR HB4111 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-9)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Permits Office of Emergency Management to enter into agreement with nonprofit organization representing sheriffs under which organization is authorized to administer program to produce and sell outdoor recreation search and rescue cards. Directs Office of Emergency Management to establish and administer voluntary Oregon outdoor recreation search and rescue card program.] Establishes Oregon Search and Rescue Fund. Continuously appropriates moneys in fund to office to reimburse county sheriffs for search and rescue activities and to administer and support county search and rescue grant program.] Directs office to establish county search and rescue grant program to distribute moneys to counties for equipment, training and educational outreach.] Establishes requirements for agreement. Provides that organization may use revenues from program only to reimburse administrative costs and expenses, to reimburse county sheriffs' offices for certain costs relating to search and rescue and to issue grants for search and rescue purposes. Declares emergency, effective on passage.] Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to funding for search and rescue; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | Senate | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-02-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williams, Helt. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Hayden; Excused, 1--Greenlick; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Hernandez. |
2020-02-19 | House | Carried over to February 20, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2020-02-18 | House | Second reading. |
2020-02-17 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2020-02-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2020-02-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |