OR HB4110 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prescribes grace periods for payment of premiums on certain types of health insurance. Requires notice for nonpayment of premiums to be mailed specified number of days prior to end of grace period. Authorizes Department of Consumer and Business Services to prescribe by rule content of notices sent for nonpayment of premiums. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to health insurance; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08SenateAt Desk upon adjournment.
2020-02-28SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2020-02-25SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2020-02-20SenateReferred to Health Care.
2020-02-20SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2020-02-20HouseThird reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 1--Greenlick; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Fahey, Speaker Kotek.
2020-02-19HouseCarried over to February 20, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2020-02-18HouseSecond reading.
2020-02-17HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2020-02-11HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-06HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Health Care.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback