OR HB4110 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Chapter 98, (2016 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Chapter 98, (2016 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increases percentage of federal earned income credit allowed to personal income taxpayer, based upon age of taxpayer's dependent. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2017, and before January 1, 2020. Provides, for purposes of statute ensuring payment of charges against real property transferred to tax-exempt government transferee, that conveyance does not include transfer of fee title of less than entire parcel of property for state highway, county road or city street purposes. Modifies appointment qualifications required of Director of Department of Revenue and deputy director of department. Extends expiration date of preliminary certificate for tax credit for energy conservation projects with certain conditions. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to taxation; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Chapter 98, (2016 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2016. |
2016-04-04 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-03 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 57; Nays, 3--Post, Weidner, Whitsett. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Olsen, granted unanimous consent to change vote to aye. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 2--Thatcher, Whitsett; excused, 2--Shields, Winters. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Carried over to 03-02 by unanimous consent. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-02-19 | House | Third reading. Carried by Reardon. Passed.Ayes, 54; Nays, 4--Esquivel, Post, Weidner, Whitsett; Excused, 2--Barton, Boone. |
2016-02-18 | House | Second reading. |
2016-02-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2016-02-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2016-02-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2016-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |