OR HB4110 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Chapter 97, (2014 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits insurer from denying reimbursement under health benefit plan for covered services provided to person in custody of local supervisory authority, if person is in custody pending disposition of charges. Prohibits insurer from denying reimbursement under health benefit plan for covered services provided to person in custody of county sheriffÙ local supervisory authority, if person is in custody pending disposition of charges. Requires insurer to reimburse county sheriff for covered services at no less than out-of-network provider rate.Ù Requires Oregon Health Authority to convene temporary work group of interested persons to study private health insurance and self-insured health plan exclusions and other limitations on coverage of groups of individuals or health services.Ù Expands definition of "biosimilar product" for purpose of substitution by pharmacist of prescribed biological product for another biological product.Ù Declares emergency, effective on passage.Ù Specifies rates at which insurer must reimburse costs of health services provided to person in custody pending disposition of charges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to health care.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-08HouseChapter 97, (2014 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2015.
2014-04-01HouseGovernor signed.
2014-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2014-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2014-03-07SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Bates. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist.
2014-03-07SenateSecond reading.
2014-03-07SenateRecommendation: Do pass the C-Eng. bill.
2014-03-07SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2014-03-07SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2014-03-07HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Greenlick. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Conger, Thompson.
2014-03-07HouseSecond reading.
2014-03-06HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed C-Engrossed.
2014-03-06HouseWork Session held.
2014-03-05HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2014-03-05HouseWork Session held.
2014-03-05HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2014-02-20HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
2014-02-20HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2014-02-20HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed B-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2014-02-18HouseWork Session held.
2014-02-17HouseWork Session held.
2014-02-14HouseReferred to Rules by order of Speaker.
2014-02-14HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Rules.
2014-02-12HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2014-02-03HouseReferred to Health Care.
2014-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/Overview/HB4110
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4110/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4110/House%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4110/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4110/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4110/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4110/House%20Amendments%20to%20B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4110/C-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4110/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20046
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20133
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=319249
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20289
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=319271

Bill Comments

feedback