OR HB4110 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Chapter 72, (2012 Laws): Effective date March 27, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to investment in companies doing business in Iran; and declaring an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to investment in companies doing business in Iran; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-27 Chapter 72, (2012 Laws): Effective date March 27, 2012.
2012-03-27 Governor signed.
2012-02-29 President signed.
2012-02-29 Co-Speakers signed.
2012-02-27 Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed. Ayes, 26; nays, 2--George, Shields; excused, 2--Dingfelder, Winters.
2012-02-25 Carried over to 02-27 by unanimous consent.
2012-02-24 Second reading.
2012-02-24 Recommendation: Do pass.
2012-02-22 Public Hearing and Work Session held.
2012-02-20 Referred to Finance and Revenue.
2012-02-17 First reading. Referred to President's desk.
2012-02-16 Third reading. Carried by Greenlick, Weidner. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Cowan, Lindsay, Smith G..
2012-02-15 Second reading.
2012-02-14 Recommendation: Do pass.
2012-02-13 Work Session held.
2012-02-10 Public Hearing held.
2012-02-01 Referred to Revenue.
2012-02-01 First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback