OR HB4109 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Environmental Quality and State Forestry Department to study opportunities for state actions to promote carbon sequestration and to include in study consideration of regional approaches for reducing greenhouse gas emissions through carbon sequestration. Requires departments to report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to natural resources by September 15, 2019. Sunsets January 2, 2020.
Title
Relating to carbon sequestration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |