OR HB4108 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that, for purposes of Oregon Public Service Retirement Plan, salary includes housing allowance paid to prison chaplain.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to salary under Public Employees Retirement System.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08SenateAt Desk upon adjournment.
2020-02-26SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2020-02-20SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2020-02-18SenateReferred to Labor and Business.
2020-02-18SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2020-02-17HouseThird reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 39; Nays, 16--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Drazan, Gomberg, Hayden, Lewis, Moore-Green, Nearman, Noble, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Zika; Excused, 4--Clem, Greenlick, Post, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Nosse.
2020-02-14HouseSecond reading.
2020-02-13HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2020-02-12HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-10HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Business and Labor.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/Measures/Overview/HB4108
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4108/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4108/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4108/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4108/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4108/B-Engrossed
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/30558
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=487284
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/30681

Bill Comments

feedback