OR HB4108 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Chapter 95, (2014 Laws): Effective date April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Oregon Health Authority to contract with nonprofit organizations to operate pilot project to provide used durable medical equipment to medical assistance recipients. Requires Oregon Health Authority to contract with community-basedÙ nonprofit organizations to operate pilot project to provide used durable medical equipment to medical assistance recipients. Appropriates moneys to Oregon Health Authority for grants to community-basedÙ nonprofit organizations operating pilot project. Sunsets pilot project January 2Ù April 20, 2018. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to durable medical equipment; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-08HouseChapter 95, (2014 Laws): Effective date April 1, 2014.
2014-04-01HouseGovernor signed.
2014-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2014-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2014-03-06SenateThird reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed.Ayes, 30.
2014-03-05SenateSecond reading.
2014-03-05SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2014-03-04SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2014-03-04SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2014-03-03HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Keny-Guyer. Passed.Ayes, 54; Nays, 4--Esquivel, Freeman, Hanna, Hicks; Excused, 2--Berger, Weidner.
2014-03-03HouseSecond reading.
2014-03-03HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2014-02-28HouseWork Session held.
2014-02-24HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2014-02-24HouseWork Session held.
2014-02-17HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
2014-02-10HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2014-02-10HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2014-02-05HouseWork Session held.
2014-02-03HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2014-02-03HouseReferred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2014-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback