OR HB4107 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Makes unlawful practice for place of public accommodation to refuse to accept United States coins or currency as payment for goods and services. Creates limited exceptions. Allows person to file complaint with Commissioner of Bureau of Labor and Industries alleging unlawful practice against operator or person acting on behalf of place of public accommodation. Becomes operative on July 1, 2021. Allows person to bring civil action alleging unlawful practice against operator or person acting on behalf of place of public accommodation. Becomes operative on January 1, 2022.] Limits authority of school district to become member of voluntary organization that administers interscholastic activities unless organization implements policy that prohibits discrimination based on race, color or national origin. Clarifies meaning of race to include natural hair, hair texture, hair type and protective hairstyles for purposes of prohibited discrimination under antidiscrimination statutes. Clarifies that valid dress code or policy may not have disproportionate adverse impact on members of protected class.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to discrimination.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and request referral to Rules (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Motion to substitute Minority Report (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08SenateAt Desk upon adjournment.
2020-03-03SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2020-02-28SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2020-02-26SenateReferred to Rules by order of the President.
2020-02-26SenateRecommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules.
2020-02-25SenateWork Session held.
2020-02-20SenateReferred to Labor and Business.
2020-02-20SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2020-02-19HouseThird reading. Carried by Bynum, Noble. Passed. Ayes, 45; Nays, 12--Barreto, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Leif, Nearman, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Wallan, Wilson; Excused, 3--Clem, Gorsek, Greenlick.
2020-02-19HouseMotion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report carried. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Clem, Gorsek, Greenlick.
2020-02-18HouseSecond reading.
2020-02-17HouseMinority Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2020-02-17HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2020-02-12HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-03HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/Measures/Overview/HB4107
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4107/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4107/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4107/House%20Minority%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4107/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4107/Minority%20Report%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4107/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4107/B-Engrossed
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/30597
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=487580
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=487613
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/30734
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/30772

Bill Comments

feedback