OR HB4107 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 31, (2018 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires health benefit plan that reimburses cost of osteopathic manipulative treatment by osteopathic physician to reimburse cost of evaluation that resulted in treatment. Prohibits insurer from denying reimbursement on basis that evaluation and osteopathic manipulative treatment are provided on same date. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to health benefit plan reimbursement of osteopathic services; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26HouseChapter 31, (2018 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2018.
2018-03-16HouseGovernor signed.
2018-02-28SenatePresident signed.
2018-02-28HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-02-26SenateThird reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Baertschiger Jr, Girod, Kruse.
2018-02-23SenateSecond reading.
2018-02-23SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2018-02-21SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-19SenateReferred to Health Care.
2018-02-19SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-02-16HouseThird reading. Carried by Heard, Malstrom. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 2--Greenlick, Holvey; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
2018-02-15HouseRules suspended. Carried over to February 16, 2018 Calendar.
2018-02-14HouseSecond reading.
2018-02-13HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2018-02-12HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Health Care.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback