OR HB4104 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Chapter 94, (2014 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits health benefit plan that provides coverage for injured worker from excluding, and requires plan to expedite, preauthorizations for medical services. Guarantees payment, to extent of terms, conditions and benefits of plan, for medical services provided if worker has filed workers' compensation claim prior to acceptance or denial of workers' compensation claim.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to payment of medical expenses for injured workers.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2014-03-03 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-08HouseChapter 94, (2014 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2015.
2014-04-01HouseGovernor signed.
2014-03-06SenatePresident signed.
2014-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2014-03-03HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 52; Nays, 6--Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Sprenger, Whisnant; Excused, 2--Berger, Weidner.
2014-02-28SenateThird reading. Carried by Edwards. Passed.Ayes, 30.
2014-02-27SenateSecond reading.
2014-02-26SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2014-02-25SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2014-02-14SenateReferred to Business and Transportation.
2014-02-14SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2014-02-14HouseThird reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed.Ayes, 43; Nays, 14--Bentz, Cameron, Davis, Freeman, Gilliam, Hicks, Huffman, Johnson, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Sprenger, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 3--Conger, Hanna, Richardson.
2014-02-13HouseSecond reading.
2014-02-13HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2014-02-12HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2014-02-05HousePublic Hearing held.
2014-02-03HouseReferred to Business and Labor.
2014-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/Overview/HB4104
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4104/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4104/House%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4104/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4104/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4104/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4104/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20045
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=316681
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20213
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=318372
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=318571

Bill Comments

feedback