OR HB4102 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-7)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires coordinated care organizations to report specified information to Oregon Health Authority regarding requests for prior authorization. Requires insurers offering health benefit plans to report specified information to Department of Consumer and Business Services regarding requests for prior authorization. Creates new requirements and modifies existing requirements applicable to utilization review by insurers offering health benefit plans. Creates new requirements applicable to step therapy requirements imposed by entities providing health insurance, medical services contracts or health care service contracts, multiple employer welfare arrangements and pharmacy benefit managers. Exempts from certain new or modified requirements health benefit plans offered to public employees by Public Employees' Benefit Board and Oregon Educators Benefit Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to managing the utilization of health care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08SenateAt Desk upon adjournment.
2020-02-28SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2020-02-25SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2020-02-20SenateReferred to Health Care.
2020-02-20SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2020-02-20HouseThird reading. Carried by Prusak. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 1--Greenlick; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Barreto, Clem, Speaker Kotek, Stark.
2020-02-19HouseCarried over to February 20, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2020-02-18HouseSecond reading.
2020-02-17HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2020-02-11HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-04HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Health Care.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback