OR HB4101 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Oregon Health Authority to ensure reimbursement of health services delivered using telemedicine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to medical assistance reimbursement of telemedicine.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08HouseAt Desk upon adjournment.
2020-02-27HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-02-27HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-26HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2020-02-26HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-25HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2020-02-18HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2020-02-18HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2020-02-13HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-11HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback