OR HB4098 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Department of Education, in consultation with STEM Investment Council, to develop statewide, long-term strategic plan to provide computer science education. Sunsets January 2, 2026. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to computer science education; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08HouseAt Desk upon adjournment.
2020-03-03HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2020-02-28HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-25HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2020-02-25HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-19HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Education.
2020-02-17HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2020-02-17HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2020-02-12HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback