OR HB4098 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Office of Emergency Management and Oregon Homeland Security Council to develop and administer grant program to distribute emergency preparedness equipment to local governments and other recipients. Authorizes sale of bonds under Article XI-Q of Oregon Constitution to fund grant program. Establishes Resiliency Grant Fund. Continuously appropriates moneys in fund to Office of Emergency Management. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to emergency preparedness; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-02-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2016-02-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2016-02-04 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2016-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |