OR HB4097 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-14)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-14)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes income tax credit for volunteer firefighters. Establishes income tax credit for volunteer firefighters. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2023, and before January 1, 2029. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to an income tax credit for volunteer firefighters; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - House Withdraw from Committee (Y: 27 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2022-03-02 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Nathanson. |
2022-03-02 | House | Motion to withdraw from Revenue failed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 32--Alonso Leon, Bynum, Campos, Dexter, Fahey, Grayber, Helm, Holvey, Hoy, Hudson, Kropf, Lively, Marsh, McLain, Nathanson, Nelson, Nosse, Pham, Power, Prusak, Reardon, Reynolds, Ruiz, Salinas, Sanchez, Schouten, Smith Warner, Sosa, Speaker Rayfield, Valderrama, Williams, Witt; Excused, 1--Zika. |
2022-02-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |