OR HB4097 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At President's desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At President's desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits police officer from conducting or participating in activities intended to determine whether person has paid certain user charges, fees or tolls imposed by mass transit district. Specifies exceptions.
Title
Relating to mass transit districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | Senate | At President's desk upon adjournment. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-02-18 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Wilde. |
2020-02-18 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hernandez. Passed. Ayes, 31; Nays, 27--Barker, Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Drazan, Evans, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McKeown, Moore-Green, Nearman, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilde, Wilson, Witt, Zika; Excused, 2--Clem, Greenlick. |
2020-02-17 | House | Second reading. |
2020-02-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2020-02-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |