OR HB4097 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 29, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 29, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to law libraries and law library services provided by certain counties. Modifies provisions relating to law libraries and law library services provided by certain counties. Authorizes presiding judge for judicial district to establish court facilitation program to assist litigants in certain court proceedings.
Title
Relating to legal resources.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Chapter 29, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019. |
2018-03-16 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 5--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Girod, Linthicum, Olsen; Excused, 2--Johnson, Kruse. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-02-21 | House | Third reading. Carried by Vial. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 4--Piluso, Rayfield, Smith G, Stark; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Smith Warner. |
2018-02-20 | House | Second reading. |
2018-02-19 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2018-02-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2018-02-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |