OR HB4096 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies law regarding requirement that public employer grant preference to veteran or disabled veteran in selection process for civil service position or eligibility list for civil service position. Limits eligibility for preference to veteran who applies within 10 years of discharge or release from service in Armed Forces of United States. Requires public employer to interview veteran who shows evidence of requested skills, required skills and transferable skills and to provide written explanation if interview is not conducted.
Title
Relating to preferences for veterans in public employment selection processes.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2016-02-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2016-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2016R1/Measures/Overview/HB4096 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2016R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4096/Introduced |