OR HB4095 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2)
Status: Failed on March 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-05 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2)
Status: Failed on March 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-05 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to regionalized land use planning; appropriating money.
Title
Relating to regionalized land use planning; appropriating money.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2012-02-10 | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2012-02-10 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2012-02-08 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-06 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. | |
2012-02-01 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |