OR HB4094 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 11, (2014 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that person is immune from prosecution for offense of possession of alcohol by person under 21 years of age if person was in need of medical assistance due to alcohol consumption or if person sought medical assistance for another person in need of medical assistance due to alcohol consumption, and evidence of offense resulted from person's having sought or obtained medical assistance . Creates defense to Provides that person is immune from prosecution for offense of possession of alcohol by person under 21 years of age if person was in need of medical assistance due to alcohol consumption or if person sought medical assistance for another person in need of medical assistance due to alcohol consumption, and evidence of offense resulted from person's having sought or obtained medical assistance for alcohol poisoning .

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to possession of alcohol by persons under 21 years of age.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-18HouseChapter 11, (2014 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2015.
2014-03-03HouseGovernor signed.
2014-02-24SenatePresident signed.
2014-02-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2014-02-20SenateThird reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed.Ayes, 30.
2014-02-19SenateSecond reading.
2014-02-19SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2014-02-18SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2014-02-14SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2014-02-14SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2014-02-13HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Doherty. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Fagan, Hanna, Richardson.
2014-02-13HouseSecond reading.
2014-02-12HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2014-02-10HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2014-02-04HousePublic Hearing held.
2014-02-03HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2014-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback