OR HB4093 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts wood residue combusted as fuel or that has marketable value from solid waste regulation.
Title
Relating to wood residue.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2020-02-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2020R1/Measures/Overview/HB4093 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4093/Introduced |