OR HB4093 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that amateur athlete is nonsubject worker for purposes of workers' compensation and is not employee for purposes of certain employment-related provisions when amateur athlete is training or conditioning for, and participating in, amateur sports activities for amateur sports organization. Specifies that amateur athlete who plays for junior ice hockey team] is nonsubject worker for purposes of workers' compensation and is not employee for purposes of certain employment-related provisions when amateur athlete is playing for team] training or conditioning for, and participating in, amateur sports activities for amateur sports organization. Requires amateur sports organization to submit annual report to Director of Department of Consumer and Business Services that includes contact information for certifying authority that has certified organization as amateur sports organization and that includes contact information for each team, league, club and association that is affiliated with or governed by organization. Requires amateur sports organization to make copies of report available to interested persons. Requires director to make reports available to public.
Title
Relating to amateur athletes.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and request referral to Rules (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Workforce. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-02-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Malstrom. Passed. Ayes, 35; Nays, 23--Alonso Leon, Barnhart, Evans, Fahey, Gomberg, Gorsek, Hernandez, Holvey, Keny-Guyer, Lively, Marsh, Meek, Nathanson, Nosse, Piluso, Power, Rayfield, Salinas, Sanchez, Smith Warner, Sollman, Williamson, Speaker Kotek; Excused, 2--Kennemer, Stark. |
2018-02-19 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 20, 2018 Calendar. |
2018-02-16 | House | Second reading. |
2018-02-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2018-02-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |