OR HB4093 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Chapter 71, (2012 Laws): Effective date June 4, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Chapter 71, (2012 Laws): Effective date June 4, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to extension of enterprise zones; and prescribing an effective date.
Title
Relating to extension of enterprise zones; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | Chapter 71, (2012 Laws): Effective date June 4, 2012. | |
2012-03-27 | Governor signed. | |
2012-03-05 | President signed. | |
2012-03-05 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-03-01 | Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed. Ayes, 27; nays, 2--Dingfelder, Shields; excused, 1--Boquist. | |
2012-02-29 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-29 | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. | |
2012-02-28 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-27 | Referred to Finance and Revenue. | |
2012-02-27 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2012-02-27 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Hanna. Passed. Ayes, 52; Nays, 6--Bailey, Cowan, Holvey, Kotek, Nolan, Tomei; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Berger, Jenson. | |
2012-02-27 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-24 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2012-02-24 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-06 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Revenue. | |
2012-02-01 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |