OR HB4092 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Chapter 77, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 29, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Chapter 77, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 29, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies ballot title and certain other voters' pamphlet elements for House Joint Resolution 203 (2016). Requires President of Senate and Speaker of House of Representatives to convene legislative work group to determine methods to improve process for preparing arguments in support of measures referred to electors by Legislative Assembly.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to measures referred by the Legislative Assembly; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Chapter 77, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 29, 2016. |
2016-03-29 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed.Ayes, 19; nays, 10--Baertschiger Jr, Ferrioli, Girod, Johnson, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 1--Winters. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Carried over to 02-29 by unanimous consent. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-02-11 | House | Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed.Ayes, 55; Nays, 2--Barton, Taylor; Excused, 3--Evans, Gorsek, Heard. |
2016-02-10 | House | Second reading. |
2016-02-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2016-02-08 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2016-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |