OR HB4091 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Education to develop and implement statewide education plan for students who are Native Hawaiian or Pacific Islander. Directs Department of Education to develop and implement statewide education plan for students who are Native Hawaiian or Pacific Islander. Requires all statewide education plans to include strategies that provide for alignment with other statewide education plans. Directs Department of Education to evaluate and revise processes for collection of racial and ethnic data for purpose of developing and implementing statewide education plans. Declares emergency, effective March 9, 2022.
Title
Relating to statewide education plans; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2022-02-14 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |