OR HB4091 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Sage-Grouse Mitigation Program In-Lieu Fee Fund. Continuously appropriates moneys in fund to State Department of Fish and Wildlife for supporting efforts to restore, protect, enhance or increase habitat for sage grouse, including related administrative costs, related research or assessment activities or insurance for sage-grouse habitat.
Title
Relating to sage-grouse mitigation funding.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Barreto [R] | Sen. Lynn Findley [R] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] | Rep. Jeff Reardon [D] |
Sen. David Smith [R] | Rep. Duane Stark [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Committee Do pass and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Committee Do pass and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | Senate | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-02-11 | House | Third reading. Carried by Barreto. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Wallan. |
2020-02-10 | House | Second reading. |
2020-02-10 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2020-02-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2020-02-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |