OR HB4091 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Oregon Cash Depository Corporation as independent public corporation and prescribes corporation's purposes and powers. Directs corporation to lease or acquire real property and construct or renovate offices, facilities and business locations throughout state at which corporation receives, handles, stores and dispenses cash and other valuable property. Establishes Oregon Cash Depository Corporation Fund in State Treasury and requires corporation to deposit all moneys corporation receives into fund. Permits corporation to invest moneys in fund and fraction of corporation's deposits in accordance with provisions of Act. Subjects corporation to annual audit by Secretary of State and requires corporation to respond to recommendations in audit report. Requires study of corporation's operations every four years and report to Legislative Assembly. Requires Attorney General to defend corporation and directors, officers and employees of corporation against claim or charge brought for actions in performing duties of corporation. Becomes operative January 1, 2019. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a public corporation for establishing secure cash storage facilities in this state; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-03HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2018-02-19HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Revenue with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback