OR HB4089 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows person employed by health care facility to practice surgical technology if person is enrolled in or has completed specified apprenticeship program. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to surgical technologists; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08SenateAt Desk upon adjournment.
2020-02-25SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-02-20SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2020-02-17SenateReferred to Health Care.
2020-02-17SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2020-02-14HouseThird reading. Carried by Stark. Passed. Ayes, 50; Excused, 7--Barreto, Clem, Greenlick, Leif, Post, Smith G, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Prusak, Sollman, Speaker Kotek.
2020-02-13HouseSecond reading.
2020-02-13HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-02-11HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-06HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Health Care.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback