OR HB4088 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 28, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 28, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits certain activities by, and specifies additional duties for, performing rights society in notifying business proprietors concerning proprietors' duties with respect to performing copyrighted musical works and in negotiating contracts for paying royalties for performing copyrighted musical works.
Title
Relating to regulating operations of performing rights societies.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Chapter 28, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019. |
2018-03-16 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-02-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | DeBoer declared potential conflict of interest. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-02-08 | House | Third reading. Carried by Boles. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Nearman. |
2018-02-07 | House | Second reading. |
2018-02-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2018-02-05 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |