OR HB4087 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows payment from Wage Security Fund to be made to wage claimant for wages earned and unpaid in event that Commissioner of Bureau of Labor and Industries has obtained judgment in action or has issued final order in administrative proceeding for collection of wage claim. Directs portion of remainder of sums collected from employers as civil penalties for violations of certain employment laws to be credited to Bureau of Labor and Industries Account to provide technical assistance to employers and portion of remainder of sums collected to be credited to Wage Security Fund. Caps total amounts credited to Bureau of Labor and Industries Account and to Wage Security Fund at $290,000 per year. Directs any amount remaining that exceeds cap to be paid to Department of State Lands for benefit of Common School Fund.] Directs bureau to submit to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to business and labor, by September 15, 2022, report that describes how moneys credited to Bureau of Labor and Industries Account were spent on providing technical assistance to employers. Sunsets provisions on January 1, 2023.].
Title
Relating to employment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-02-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2020-02-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-26 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2020-02-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-21 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2020-02-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2020-02-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Business and Labor with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |