OR HB4087 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 58, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 58, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that person may not create, attach, assert or claim possessory lien on motor vehicle unless person performs service that complies with certain statutes and that involves making, altering, repairing, transporting, storing, providing services for, supplying material for or performing labor in connection with motor vehicle and person is franchised motor vehicle dealership, holds towing business certificate or creates, attaches, asserts or claims lien against abandoned motor vehicle. Requires person, before creating, attaching, asserting or claiming lien on motor vehicle, to have in effect bond of not less than $20,000 for purpose of paying owner of motor vehicle full amount of damages, costs, reimbursements or attorney fees owner obtains in action to obtain release or restored title to motor vehicle. Permits owner to bring action and obtain damages and other relief.] Requires person other than franchised motor vehicle dealership, person that holds towing business certificate or person that creates, attaches, asserts or claims lien against abandoned motor vehicle to have in effect valid surety bond in amount not less than $20,000 before making, altering, repairing, transporting, storing, performing services for, supplying materials for or performing labor in connection with motor vehicle. Permits owner of motor vehicle to bring action and obtain damages and other relief.
Title
Relating to possessory liens on motor vehicles.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Chapter 58, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019. |
2018-04-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Nearman, Post; Excused, 2--Hayden, Heard. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | DeBoer declared potential conflict of interest. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Linthicum. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 1--Girod; Excused, 1--Kruse. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-02-08 | House | Third reading. Carried by Evans. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 3--Post, Stark, Wilson; Excused, 1--Nearman. |
2018-02-07 | House | Second reading. |
2018-02-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2018-02-05 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |