OR HB4087 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Permits police officer or law enforcement unit to petition circuit court to require law enforcement unit to withhold from disclosure identifying information of police officer or police officer's immediate family if police officer or police officer's immediate family received credible threat of present danger to life of police officer or police officer's immediate family. Prohibits official action relating to employment or certification of police officer solely because police officer is on impeachment list or because of unproven allegation that police officer committed act or omission of kind for which name of police officer may be placed on impeachment list. Prohibits use of certain evidence regarding impeachment list in administrative hearing related to official action.] Specifies that identifying information under protective order may be withheld for 90 days. Permits police officer or law enforcement to request extension of protective order. Permits plaintiff who brings cause of action against law enforcement unit for act or omission committed by police officer whose identifying information is under protective order to petition court to release identifying information of police officer. Defines "law enforcement unit" and "police officer." Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to police officers; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Carla Piluso [D] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Sen. Laurie Monnes Anderson [D] | Sen. Chris Gorsek [D] |
Rep. Susan McLain [D] | Rep. Jeff Reardon [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-02-17 | House | Third reading. Carried by Barker. Passed.Ayes, 55; Nays, 3--Parrish, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 1--Barton; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Buckley. |
2016-02-16 | House | Second reading. |
2016-02-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2016-02-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2016-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2016-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |