OR HB4087 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Chapter 93, (2014 Laws): Effective date April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Chapter 93, (2014 Laws): Effective date April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on School Safety. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of State Police for purposes of task force.Ù Sunsets task force on date of convening of 2017 regular session of Legislative Assembly. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to school safety; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Chapter 93, (2014 Laws): Effective date April 1, 2014. |
2014-04-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, George, Whitsett. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2014-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Barker. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Hicks, Whitsett; Excused, 2--Berger, Weidner. |
2014-03-04 | House | Second reading. |
2014-03-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2014-03-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-27 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2014-02-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-27 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2014-02-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2014-02-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Veterans' Services and Emergency Preparedness with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |