OR HB4086 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-03 - Chapter 6, (2022 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-03 - Chapter 6, (2022 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amends provisions of workers' compensation law related to beneficiaries. Amends provisions of workers' compensation law related to beneficiaries. Expands scope of retaliation provision for workers' compensation benefits. Amends definitions of "beneficiary," "child" and "dependent" and replaces term "invalid" with "incapacitated."
Title
Relating to workers' compensation benefits.
Sponsors
Rep. Karin Power [D] | Sen. Kathleen Taylor [D] | Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D] | Sen. Wlnsvey Campos [D] |
Rep. Maxine Dexter [D] | Rep. Dacia Grayber [D] | Rep. Nancy Nathanson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | Chapter 6, (2022 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2023. |
2022-03-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-02-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 4--Gelser Blouin, Girod, Linthicum, Thatcher; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 2--Boquist, Robinson. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2022-02-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Power. Passed. Ayes, 48; Nays, 6--Goodwin, Morgan, Owens, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark; Excused, 4--Nelson, Noble, Ruiz, Scharf; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Sosa, Speaker Rayfield. |
2022-02-11 | House | Second reading. |
2022-02-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2022-02-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |