OR HB4086 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on March 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-15 - Chapter 27, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 8, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on March 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-15 - Chapter 27, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 8, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for temporary lockout benefits, equal to weekly unemployment benefit amount of individual's most recent unemployment benefit claim, to individual who is unemployed due to lockout. Caps temporary lockout benefits at lesser of 26 times weekly benefit amount of individual's most recent unemployment benefit claim or amount paid before lockout ends. Provides that employer shall be charged for temporary lockout benefits in manner provided for charging employers for regular benefits. Provides for retroactive payment of temporary lockout benefits to individuals unemployed due to lockout at time of passage of measure. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to unemployment benefits of individuals who are unemployed due to lockouts; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-15 | House | Chapter 27, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 8, 2016. |
2016-03-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 20; nays, 6--Baertschiger Jr, Kruse, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 4--Boquist, Knopp, Shields, Winters. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-02-29 | House | Third reading. Carried by Rayfield, Olson. Passed.Ayes, 48; Nays, 10--Barreto, Buehler, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Post, Stark, Weidner, Whitsett; Absent, 1--Clem; Excused, 1--Nearman. |
2016-02-26 | House | Second reading. |
2016-02-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2016-02-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2016-02-24 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2016-02-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2016-02-20 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2016-02-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2016-02-05 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to Business and Labor with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2016-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |