OR HB4083 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires person, before sending unsolicited check, draft or other payment instrument or offer to extend credit or lend money to consumer, either to send notice to consumer at least seven days in advance or to establish and use system by which consumer must affirmatively consent to receive check, draft or other payment instrument or offer to extend credit or lend money. Provides that violation of requirement is unlawful practice subject to enforcement under Unlawful Trade Practices Act. Becomes operative July 1, 2014. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to unsolicited offers of business; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Caddy McKeown [D] | Rep. Jim Weidner [R] | Rep. Margaret Doherty [D] | Sen. Chris Gorsek [D] |
Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] | Rep. Jeff Reardon [D] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2014-02-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Efficiency. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2014R1/Measures/Overview/HB4083 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4083/Introduced |