OR HB4082 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
Pending: Joint Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Behavioral Health Road Map Commission in Legislative Assembly. Specifies membership and duties. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to behavioral health; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-11 - House - House Committee (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-17HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2020-02-17HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2020-02-11HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-06HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-04HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Behavioral Health with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback