OR HB4082 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on March 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Chapter 1, (2018 Laws): Effective date February 28, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on March 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Chapter 1, (2018 Laws): Effective date February 28, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Youth Authority to administer Juvenile Justice Information System in partnership with county juvenile departments. Permits disclosure of certain juvenile records to researchers, evaluators and data analysts] government agencies, post-secondary institutions of education and persons with whom youth authority, county or county juvenile department has entered into disclosure agreement. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the Juvenile Justice Information System; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | House | Chapter 1, (2018 Laws): Effective date February 28, 2018. |
2018-02-28 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-02-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Wagner. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Kruse, Riley. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-02-09 | House | Third reading. Carried by Piluso. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Clem, Kennemer. |
2018-02-08 | House | Second reading. |
2018-02-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2018-02-06 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |