OR HB4082 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-8)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter 10, (2016 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-8)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter 10, (2016 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expands crime of promoting prostitution to include receiving goods, services or other things of value derived from prostitution activity in certain circumstances.
Title
Relating to promoting prostitution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | House | Chapter 10, (2016 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2017. |
2016-03-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-02-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser, Knopp. Passed.Ayes, 25; excused, 5--Boquist, Shields, Thatcher, Whitsett, Winters. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-02-04 | House | Third reading. Carried by Taylor, Huffman. Passed.Ayes, 54; Excused, 4--Evans, Krieger, Olson, Smith; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Bentz, Vega Pederson. |
2016-02-03 | House | Second reading. |
2016-02-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2016-02-01 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2016-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |