OR HB4082 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Chapter 97, (2012 Laws): Effective date April 11, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Chapter 97, (2012 Laws): Effective date April 11, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to court appointed special advocates; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to court appointed special advocates; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Chapter 97, (2012 Laws): Effective date April 11, 2012. | |
2012-04-11 | Governor signed. | |
2012-03-02 | President signed. | |
2012-03-01 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-02-29 | Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist. | |
2012-02-28 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-28 | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. | |
2012-02-27 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2012-02-27 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2012-02-27 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Read. Passed. Ayes, 60. | |
2012-02-27 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-24 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. | |
2012-02-24 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-23 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2012-02-23 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-17 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. | |
2012-02-07 | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2012-02-07 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2012-02-06 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Human Services with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. | |
2012-02-01 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |