OR HB4079 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 56, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 56, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Department of Human Services to disregard as resources moneys held in specified pension and retirement accounts in determining eligibility for temporary assistance for needy families.
Title
Relating to retirement accounts for low income individuals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Chapter 56, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019. |
2018-04-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Boquist. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by DeBoer. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 6--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Girod, Linthicum, Olsen, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Kruse, Thatcher. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-03-01 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB. |
2018-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 51; Nays, 7--Barreto, Bonham, Esquivel, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Smith DB; Excused, 1--Gorsek; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Olson. |
2018-03-01 | House | Second reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2018-02-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-26 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2018-02-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-19 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Early Childhood and Family Supports with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |