OR HB4079 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Chapter 52, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 15, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Chapter 52, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 15, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Land Conservation and Development Commission to establish pilot program in which local governments may site and develop affordable housing. Appropriates moneys to Department of Land Conservation and Development to establish pilot program. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to housing; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng bill. (Printed C-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and bill be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means, and be referred to Rules. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng bill. (Printed C-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and bill be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means, and be referred to Rules. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | House | Chapter 52, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 15, 2016. |
2016-03-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Edwards. Passed.Ayes, 16; nays, 11--Bates, Burdick, Devlin, Gelser, Hass, Monnes Anderson, Prozanski, Riley, Rosenbaum, Thatcher, President Courtney; excused, 3--Boquist, Shields, Winters. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the C-Eng. bill. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-03-01 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Mclain. |
2016-03-01 | House | Third reading. Carried by Stark. Passed.Ayes, 31; Nays, 25--Barreto, Barton, Buckley, Clem, Evans, Fagan, Frederick, Gallegos, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Holvey, Hoyle, Kennemer, Lininger, McLain, Nathanson, Nosse, Piluso, Rayfield, Read, Reardon, Taylor, Vega Pederson; Excused, 4--Barnhart, Gilliam, McKeown, Nearman. |
2016-02-29 | House | Second reading. |
2016-02-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed C-Engrossed. |
2016-02-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2016-02-25 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2016-02-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2016-02-24 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2016-02-19 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2016-02-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed B-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2016-02-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2016-02-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2016-02-15 | House | Work Session cancelled. |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2016-02-11 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2016-02-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded, and be referred to Rules. |
2016-02-10 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to Rural Communities, Land Use and Water with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2016-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |