OR HB4078 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits remote sales of inhalant delivery systems. Defines "inhalant delivery system." Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to inhalant delivery systems; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08SenateAt Desk upon adjournment.
2020-02-24SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-02-18SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2020-02-13SenateReferred to Health Care.
2020-02-12SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2020-02-11HouseThird reading. Carried by Marsh. Passed. Ayes, 41; Nays, 18--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Hayden, Leif, Lewis, Moore-Green, Nearman, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 1--Wallan.
2020-02-10HouseSecond reading.
2020-02-10HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-02-06HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-04HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Health Care.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback