OR HB4078 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates Transit Expansion Fund. Continuously appropriates moneys in fund to Department of Transportation. Authorizes Department of Transportation to issue grants to entities that provide public transportation in rural communities, small urban communities and certain large urban communities for purpose of maintaining or expanding public transportation systems. Sunsets June 30, 2036.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to grants for public transportation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-03HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2016-02-03HousePublic Hearing held.
2016-02-01HouseReferred to Transportation and Economic Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2016-02-01HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2016-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback