OR HB4078 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Chapter 92, (2014 Laws): Effective date April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Validates urban growth boundary adopted by Metro and acknowledged by Land Conservation and Development Commission as acknowledged urban growth boundary of Metro. Validates urban reserves and rural reserves adopted by Metro, and counties within Metro, with exceptions. Modifies review process for post-acknowledgment changes in Metro regional framework plan. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to post-acknowledgement changes to regional framework plan in Metro; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-08HouseChapter 92, (2014 Laws): Effective date April 1, 2014.
2014-04-01HouseGovernor signed.
2014-03-07SenatePresident signed.
2014-03-07HouseSpeaker signed.
2014-03-04SenateThird reading. Carried by Burdick, Starr. Passed.Ayes, 30.
2014-03-03SenateSecond reading.
2014-03-03SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2014-03-03SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2014-02-28SenateReferred to Rules.
2014-02-28SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2014-02-28HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Clem, Davis. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Smith.
2014-02-28HouseSecond reading.
2014-02-27HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2014-02-27HouseWork Session held.
2014-02-25HouseWork Session held.
2014-02-14HouseReferred to Rules by order of Speaker.
2014-02-14HouseWithout recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules.
2014-02-13HouseWork Session held.
2014-02-04HousePublic Hearing held.
2014-02-03HouseReferred to Rural Communities.
2014-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/Overview/HB4078
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4078/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4078/House%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4078/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4078/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20099
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20225
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=318342
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20238
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=318755

Bill Comments

feedback