OR HB4077 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires seller of real property to test well water used for domestic purposes. Requires laboratory to submit results of test to seller, buyer and Department of Environmental Quality, in form and manner prescribed by department. Requires department to provide results of well water tests to Oregon Health Authority. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to wells that supply ground water for domestic purposes; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2020-02-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Water. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2020R1/Measures/Overview/HB4077 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4077/Introduced |